US HB1339 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-22-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Access to Reconstructive Evaluation & Surgery (CARES) Act of 2009 - Amends the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), and the Internal Revenue Code to require a group health plan that covers surgical benefits to also cover outpatient and inpatient diagnosis and treatment of a congenital or developmental deformity, disease, or injury of a minor child (defined as child under the age of 22). Requires that such coverage: (1) be subject to pre-authorization or pre-certification requirements of the plan or issuer; and (2) include any surgical treatment deemed by the treating physician to be medically necessary to approximate a normal appearance. Defines "treatment" to include reconstructive surgical procedures that are performed on abnormal structures of the body caused by congenital defects, abnormalities, trauma, infection, tumors, or disease, including: (1) procedures that do not materially affect the function of the body part being treated; and (2) procedures for secondary conditions and follow-up treatment. Excludes cosmetic surgery performed to reshape normal structures of the body to improve appearance or self-esteem.
Title
Children's Access to Reconstructive Evaluation & Surgery (CARES) Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-03-06 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1235 (Same As) 2009-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Accidents
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Hereditary and development disorders
Surgery and anesthesia
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Hereditary and development disorders
Surgery and anesthesia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1339/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1339/BILLS-111hr1339ih.pdf |