US HB1336 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social Impact Partnership Act Amends title XX (Block Grants to States for Social Services and Elder Justice) of the Social Security Act to add a new part C (Social Impact Partnerships). Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to publish in the Federal Register a request for proposals from states or local government for social impact partnership projects which produce measurable, clearly defined outcomes that result in social benefit, such as employment for the unemployed, high school graduation, and reduction of teen and unplanned pregnancies as well as incidences and adverse consequences of child abuse and neglect. Requires applications to include a feasibility study, funded under this Act, which contains specified information. Requires the Director to decide whether to enter into such a contract within six months after receiving an application. Requires independent evaluation to determine whether the state or local government project has met an outcome specified in the contract in order for such governments to receive outcome payments. Makes appropriations for 10 years to carry out this Act. Establishes the Federal Interagency Council on Social Impact Partnerships. Amends the Community Reinvestment Act of 1977 to require the appropriate federal financial supervisory agency to consider, in assessing and taking into account the record of a financial institution in meeting the credit needs of its entire community, its investments in social impact partnership projects.
Title
Social Impact Partnership Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1089 (Related) 2015-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5170 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5170 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Adoption and foster care
Advisory bodies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime prevention
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Education of the disadvantaged
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Intergovernmental relations
Mental health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Sex and reproductive health
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Teenage pregnancy
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Youth employment and child labor
Adoption and foster care
Advisory bodies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Crime prevention
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Disability and paralysis
Domestic violence and child abuse
Education of the disadvantaged
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health promotion and preventive care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Intergovernmental relations
Mental health
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Sex and reproductive health
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Teenage pregnancy
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1336/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1336/BILLS-114hr1336ih.pdf |