US HB1331 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 grants to states for (1) programs that manage and control pollution added from nonpoint sources to navigable waters, and (2) groundwater quality protection activities to advance state implementation of such programs. Water pollution from nonpoint sources is caused by precipitation picking up pollution as it moves over or through the ground.
Title
Local Water Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 158 (Y: 329 N: 56 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2019-04-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 329 - 56 (Roll no. 158). (text: CR H3109) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3116-3117) |
2019-04-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3109-3111) |
2019-04-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1331. |
2019-04-08 | House | Mrs. Craig moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 17. |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-36. |
2019-03-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Marine pollution
Mining
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water resources funding
Environmental protection
Marine pollution
Mining
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water resources funding