US HB1329 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on November 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-75. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on November 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-75. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2017, the rates of veterans' wartime disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. Each such increase shall be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date. The VA may adjust administratively, consistent with such increases, the rates of disability compensation payable to persons entitled to veterans benefits under public laws administered by the VA on December 31, 1958, who have not received benefits under provisions governing veterans compensation for service-connected disability or death. (Sec. 3) The VA shall publish such increased rates in the Federal Register not later than the date on which certain social security increases are required to be published in FY2018.
Title
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-02 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-75. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-05-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4476) |
2017-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1329. |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4476-4477) |
2017-05-23 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 83. |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-134. |
2017-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB784 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299.
HB4958 (Related) 2018-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-258.
SB3089 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB4958 (Related) 2018-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-258.
SB3089 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation