US HB1321 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - Became Public Law No: 114-114. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - Became Public Law No: 114-114. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to ban rinse-off cosmetics that contain intentionally-added plastic microbeads beginning on January 1, 2018, and to ban manufacturing of these cosmetics beginning on July 1, 2017. These bans are delayed by one year for cosmetics that are over-the-counter drugs.
Title
Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] |
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. David Trott [R-MI] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-28 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-114. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-12-22 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8861) |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-12-07 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9021) |
2015-12-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1321. |
2015-12-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9021-9022) |
2015-12-07 | House | Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 283. |
2015-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-371. |
2015-11-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-11-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1424 (Same As) 2015-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Marine pollution
Water quality
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Marine pollution
Water quality