US HB1316 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-14)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act This bill adds certain transparency requirements for pharmacy benefits managers under Medicare, Medicare Advantage, TRICARE, and the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program.
Title
Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Armed Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Consumer affairs
Contracts and agency
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Insurance industry and regulation
Medical ethics
Medicare
Military medicine
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Right of privacy
Consumer affairs
Contracts and agency
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Insurance industry and regulation
Medical ethics
Medicare
Military medicine
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Right of privacy
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1316/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1316/BILLS-115hr1316ih.pdf |