US HB1313 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 626.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 626.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes periods of performance for the use of public transportation security assistance grant funds. Additionally, the bill allows such grants provided for operational purposes to be used to backfill positions when employees attend security training. Funds provided pursuant to such a grant for a specified authorized use, including for tunnel protection systems and surveillance equipment, shall remain available for use by a grant recipient for at least 36 months. However, any such funds used for security improvements for public transportation systems or security improvements for stations and other public transportation infrastructure, including those owned by state or local governments, shall remain available for at least 55 months. The Government Accountability Office shall conduct a review of the public transportation security assistance grant program, including an assessment of the manner in which projects under the program address threats to public transportation infrastructure.
Title
Transit Security Grant Program Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 626. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-323. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3756-3757) |
2019-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1313. |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3756-3758) |
2019-05-14 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Public transit
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Government studies and investigations
Public transit
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security