US HB1313 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Preserving Employee Wellness Programs Act (Sec. 3) This bill exempts workplace wellness programs from: (1) limitations under the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 on medical examinations and inquiries of employees, (2) the prohibition on collecting genetic information in connection with issuing health insurance, and (3) limitations under the Genetic Information Nondiscrimination Act of 2008 on collecting the genetic information of employees or family members of employees. This exemption applies to workplace wellness programs that comply with limits on rewards for employees participating in the program. Workplace wellness programs may provide for more favorable treatment of individuals with adverse health factors, such as a disability. Collection of information about a disease or disorder of a family member as part of a workplace wellness program is not an unlawful acquisition of genetic information about another family member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserving Employee Wellness Programs Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-11HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341.
2017-12-11HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
2017-12-11HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
2017-12-11HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-459, Part I.
2017-03-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 17.
2017-03-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-03-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-03-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-03-02HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
2017-03-02HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
2017-03-02HouseReferred to House Education and the Workforce
2017-03-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback