US HB1302 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VA Appeals Backlog Relief Act Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to ensure that a Department of Veterans Affairs regional office certifies a VA Form 9, Appeal to Board of Veterans' Appeals, submitted by a veteran to appeal a decision relating to a claim, within one year after receiving such form.
Title
VA Appeals Backlog Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] |
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] |
Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-07-09 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1302/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1302/BILLS-114hr1302ih.pdf |