US HB1300 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Wildlife Act of 1956 to extend through FY2017 the authorization of appropriations for volunteer services for programs conducted by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service or the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA), community partnership projects for national wildlife refuges, and refuge education programs.
Title
To amend the Fish and Wildlife Act of 1956 to reauthorize the volunteer programs and community partnerships for the benefit of national wildlife refuges, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held. |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2013-07-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-07-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5148) |
2013-07-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1300. |
2013-07-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5148-5149) |
2013-07-30 | House | Mr. Runyan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-06-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 80. |
2013-06-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-112. |
2013-05-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-15 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Public lands and natural resources
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats