US HB1287 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 298.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 298.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dorothy Buell Memorial Visitor Center Partnership Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to enter into a memorandum of understanding to establish a joint partnership with the Porter County Convention, Recreation and Visitor Commission with regard to the use of the Dorothy Buell Memorial Visitor Center as a visitor center for the Indiana Dunes National Lakeshore. Allows the Secretary to: (1) plan, design, construct, and install exhibits in the Center related to the use and management of the resources at the Lakeshore, at a cost under $1.5 million; and (2) use park staff from the Lakeshore in the Center to provide visitor information and education. States that, for the purposes of the acquisition of lands or interests in lands outside the present boundaries of the Lakeshore, lands may be considered contiguous to other lands if the lands touch them, or are separated from them by only a public or private right-of-way, such as a road, railroad, or utility corridor.
Title
Dorothy Buell Memorial Visitor Center Partnership Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 298. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-148. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-11-04 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. | |
2009-09-09 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-09-08 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-08 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9289) | |
2009-09-08 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1287. | |
2009-09-08 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9289) | |
2009-09-08 | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Indiana
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
State and local government operations
Travel and tourism
Indiana
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
State and local government operations
Travel and tourism