US HB1272 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maple Tapping Access Program Act - Authorizes the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to make grants to states, tribal governments, and research institutions to promote the domestic maple syrup industry through: (1) promotion of research and education, (2) promotion of natural resource sustainability, (3) market promotion, and (4) encouragement of owners and operators of privately held land to initiate or expand maple-sugaring activities or to voluntarily make the land available to the public for maple-sugaring activities. Defines "maple-sugaring" as the collection of sap from any species of tree in the genus Acer for the purpose of boiling to produce food. States that nothing in this Act shall be construed to preempt a state or tribal government law, including a state or tribal government liability law.
Title
Maple Tapping Access Program Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Related) 2013-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text of measure as introduced: CR S48-156)
SB879 (Related) 2013-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB954 (Related) 2013-09-04 - By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
SB879 (Related) 2013-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB954 (Related) 2013-09-04 - By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
Subjects
Agricultural education
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural research
Agriculture and food
Food industry and services
Forests, forestry, trees
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural research
Agriculture and food
Food industry and services
Forests, forestry, trees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1272/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1272/BILLS-113hr1272ih.pdf |