US HB127 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 75-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that no funds are authorized to be appropriated to carry out the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, and any amendments made by either such Act.
Title
To deauthorize appropriation of funds to carry out the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB698 (Related) 2011-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Appropriations
Comprehensive health care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Comprehensive health care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/127/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr127/BILLS-112hr127ih.pdf |