US HB1253 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health Insurance Restrictions and Limitations Clarification Act of 2009 - Amends the Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA), the Public Health Service Act, and the Internal Revenue Code to exclude a group health plan from prohibitions against limitations or restrictions on the amount, level, extent, or nature of the benefits of coverage for similarly situated individuals enrolled in the plan so long as: (1) such limitations and restrictions are explicit and clear; (2) such limitations and restrictions have been disclosed to the plan sponsor in writing in advance of the point of sale; (3) the plan sponsor provides a description of such limitations and restrictions to participants and beneficiaries in a form that is easily understandable before enrollment; and (4) the plan sponsor and the issuer of the coverage provide such description to the participants and beneficiaries upon their enrollment under the plan at the earliest opportunity that other materials are provided.
Title
Health Insurance Restrictions and Limitations Clarification Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-04-01 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-03-31 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-03-31 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 3 (Roll no. 171). (text: CR 3/30/2009 H4087) | |
2009-03-31 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4187-4188) | |
2009-03-30 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-03-30 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1253. | |
2009-03-30 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4087-4088) | |
2009-03-30 | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 27. | |
2009-03-30 | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. | |
2009-03-30 | Committee on Education and Labor discharged. | |
2009-03-30 | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-62, Part I. | |
2009-03-04 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-03-04 | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Consumer affairs
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access