US HB1250 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide that payment under the Medicare program to a long-term care hospital for inpatient services shall not be made at the applicable site neutral payment rate for certain discharges involving severe wounds, and for other purposes. This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to prohibit payment at the applicable site neutral payment rate for discharges in a cost reporting period beginning before October 1, 2017, from subsection (d) hospitals and certain long-term care hospitals that involve certain severe wounds. (Generally, a subsection [d] hospital is an acute care hospital, particularly one that receives payments under Medicare's inpatient prospective payment system when providing covered inpatient services to eligible beneficiaries.) The Secretary of Health and Human Services shall study the treatment needs of individuals entitled to benefits under Medicare part A (Hospital Insurance), or enrolled under Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance), requiring specialized wound care, and the cost, for such individual, and the Medicare program of treating severe wounds in rural and urban areas.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide that payment under the Medicare program to a long-term care hospital for inpatient services shall not be made at the applicable site neutral payment rate for certain discharges involving severe wounds, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1211 (Same As) 2015-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Health
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Health
Hospital care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1250/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1250/BILLS-114hr1250ih.pdf |