US HB1241 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 643.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 643.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA), in any land exchange involving the conveyance of certain National Forest System land within the boundaries of Inyo National Forest in California, to accept for acquisition in such exchange certain non-federal lands in California lying outside the boundaries of the Forest, if acquiring them is desirable for National Forest System purposes. Authorizes the Secretary to accept a cash equalization payment that exceeds 25%. Requires any such payment to be deposited into the Treasury account established under the Sisk Act and made available for the acquisition of land for addition to the System. Declares that: (1) nothing in this Act shall be construed to grant the Secretary new land exchange authority, and (2) this Act modifies the use of land exchange authorities already available to the Secretary.
Title
To facilitate a land exchange involving certain National Forest System lands in the Inyo National Forest, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 643. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu without amendment. With written report No. 113-303. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2013-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2013-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7423) |
2013-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1241. |
2013-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7423) |
2013-12-03 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-12-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202. |
2013-12-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-281. |
2013-04-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1888 (Related) 2014-07-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-433.