US HB1237 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the effects of ocean and coastal acidification on marine organisms and ecosystems. Specifically, the bill reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the Ocean Acidification Program of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and the ocean acidification grant program of the National Science Foundation. The bill expands those programs, as well as the ocean acidification activities of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA), to include efforts to research and monitor the effects of coastal acidification.
Title
COAST Research Act of 2019 Coastal and Ocean Acidification Stressors and Threats Research Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-06-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4318-4320) |
2019-06-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1237. |
2019-06-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4318-4325) |
2019-06-05 | House | Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 61. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-86. |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-04-09 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2699 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB8632 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB8632 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Water quality
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Water quality