US HB1237 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law Discharged.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law Discharged.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fairness in Nursing Home Arbitration Act of 2009 - Provides that a pre-dispute arbitration agreement between a long-term care facility and a resident (or anyone acting on the resident's behalf) shall not be valid or specifically enforceable.
Title
Fairness in Nursing Home Arbitration Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Bill Delahunt [D-MA] | Rep. William Delahunt [D-MA] | Rep. Brad Ellsworth [D-IN] |
Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Deborah Halvorson [D-IL] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Mary Kilroy [D-OH] | Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] | Rep. Steven LaTourette [R-OH] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [R-PA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] | Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Melvin Watt [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law Discharged. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law. | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB512 (Related) 2009-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Aging
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Contracts and agency
Health facilities and institutions
Law
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Contracts and agency
Health facilities and institutions
Law
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1237/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1237/BILLS-111hr1237ih.pdf |