US HB1235 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 196-95-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 19 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Naismith Memorial Basketball Hall of Fame Commemorative Coin Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue not more than 50,000 $5 coins, 400,000 $1 coins, and 750,000 half-dollar coins in recognition and celebration of the Naismith Memorial Basketball Hall of Fame. The coins shall be in the shape of a dome, and the design on the common reverse of the coins shall depict a basketball. Treasury shall hold a competition to determine the design of the common obverse of the coins, which shall be emblematic of the game of basketball. (Sec. 7) The bill requires all sales of such coins to include specified surcharges, which shall be paid by Treasury to the Hall to fund an endowment for increased operations and educational programming.
Title
Naismith Memorial Basketball Hall of Fame Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7822) |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2017-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7450-7451) |
2017-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1235. |
2017-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7450-7452) |
2017-09-25 | House | Mr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1503 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Athletes
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Professional sports
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Professional sports