US HB1201 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EACH Act Equitable Access to Care and Health Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to expand the religious conscience exemption under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to exempt individuals who rely solely on a religious method of healing and for whom the acceptance of medical health services would be inconsistent with their religious beliefs from the requirement to purchase and maintain minimum essential health care coverage.
Title
EACH Act Equitable Access to Care and Health Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 529. |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2018-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7107-7108) |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1201. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7107-7109) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Roskam moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2568 (Related) 2018-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Religion
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Religion
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation