US HB1187 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to adjust certain limits on the guaranteed amount of a home loan under the home loan program of the Department of Veterans Affairs. Changes the maximum amount of a veteran's home loan of more than $144,000 that is guaranteed by the Department of Veterans Affairs to 25% of the loan amount.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to adjust certain limits on the guaranteed amount of a home loan under the home loan program of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3016 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1187/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1187/BILLS-114hr1187ih.pdf |