US HB1173 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Mental Health Access Act This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to expand the definition of "physician," for purposes of the Medicare program, to include a clinical psychologist with respect to the furnishing of qualified psychologist services.
Title
Medicare Mental Health Access Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB448 (Same As) 2017-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1173/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1173/BILLS-115hr1173ih.pdf |