US HB1149 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waterways Are Vital for the Economy, Energy, Efficiency, and Environment Act of 2013 or WAVE4 Act - Directs the Secretary of the Army, acting through the Chief of Engineers, to require certain delivery process reforms for qualifying construction and major rehabilitation projects for navigation infrastructure of inland and intracoastal waterways. Directs the Secretary, working in conjunction with the Inland Waterways Users Board, to submit to Congress a 20-year program for making capital investments on inland and intracoastal waterways. Authorizes such program to be based on the 20-year capital investment strategy contained in the Inland Marine Transportation System (IMTS) Capital Projects Business Model, Final Report published on April 13, 2010, as approved by the Board. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to limit expenditures from the Inland Waterways Trust Fund to 50% of the total cost of the construction or rehabilitation project. Makes Fund amounts unavailable for: (1) construction or rehabilitation of dams, or (2) rehabilitation expenditures that do not equal or exceed $100 million.
Title
Waterways Are Vital for the Economy, Energy, Efficiency, and Environment Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Whitfield [R-KY] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Rodney Alexander [R-LA] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] |
Rep. Jo Bonner [R-AL] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB407 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Government trust funds
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1149/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1149/BILLS-113hr1149ih.pdf |