US HB1132 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Political Appointee Burrowing Prevention Act This bill prohibits an individual employed in a political position in the civil service from being appointed to a career position in the civil service for two years after the individual separates from such political position. Such prohibition shall not apply to a political appointee who has not personally and substantially participated in any particular matter while employed in a political position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Appointee Burrowing Prevention Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-03-07SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1414-1415)
2018-03-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1132.
2018-03-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1414-1416)
2018-03-06HouseMr. Blum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-12-05HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 325.
2017-12-05HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-439.
2017-11-02HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-11-02HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2581 (Related) 2018-03-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback