US HB113 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 171-47-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safeguard American Food Exports Act of 2017 This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to deem equine (horses and other members of the equidae family) parts to be an unsafe food additive or animal drug. The bill prohibits the knowing sale or transport of equines or equine parts for human consumption.
Title
Safeguard American Food Exports Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1706 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/113/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr113/BILLS-115hr113ih.pdf |