US HB1122 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SHIELD Act of 2015 Strengthening Homeland Security, Intelligence, and Essential Law Enforcement Departments Act of 2015 Requires, in the event that the U.S. public debt limit is reached, priority payment of the pay and allowances of: (1) members of the Armed Forces, including reserves, who perform active service; and (2) critical law enforcement officers employed by federal agencies. Requires the Department of the Treasury, during a period of lapsed appropriations for the Armed Forces or federal agencies employing critical law enforcement officers, to make available necessary amounts to continue such pay and allowances.
Title
SHIELD Act of 2015 Strengthening Homeland Security, Intelligence, and Essential Law Enforcement Departments Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Armed Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget deficits and national debt
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
Budget deficits and national debt
Coast guard
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1122/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1122/BILLS-114hr1122ih.pdf |