US HB1115 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for Federal and State agency coordination in the approval of certain authorizations under the Natural Gas Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Promoting Interagency Coordination for Review of Natural Gas Pipelines Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 15. |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-23. |
2023-03-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 23. |
2023-03-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 8 . |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
HB829 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB988 (Related) 2023-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB1456 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB829 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB988 (Related) 2023-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB1456 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.