US HB1104 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Treatment for All Gifts Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a deduction from the taxable amount of gifts for gifts made to specified tax-exempt organizations, including: (1) social welfare organizations; (2) labor, agricultural, and horticultural organizations; and (3) business leagues, chambers of commerce, real-estate boards, boards of trade, and professional football leagues. Declares that for purposes of the gift tax, a transfer of property to such organizations shall not be deemed to be a transfer by gift.
Title
Fair Treatment for All Gifts Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2240) |
2015-04-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1104. |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2240-2241) |
2015-04-15 | House | Mr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 45. |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-64. |
2015-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB942 (Related) 2015-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.