US HB1079 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

CASES Act Creating Advanced Streamlined Electronic Services for Constituents Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CASES Act Creating Advanced Streamlined Electronic Services for Constituents Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 77 (Y: 379 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-13SenatePresented to President.
2019-08-01SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-31SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5275)
2019-06-25SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 127.
2019-06-25SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-50.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-02-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-02-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 0 (Roll no. 77). (text: CR H1502)
2019-02-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1504)
2019-02-11HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-02-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1079.
2019-02-11HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1502-1504)
2019-02-11HouseMs. Hill (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB435 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback