US HB1073 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish a structure for visitor services on the Arlington Ridge tract, in the area of the U.S. Marine Corps War Memorial, and for other purposes. (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to construct on the Arlington Ridge tract in the area of the U.S. Marine Corps War Memorial in Arlington County, Virginia, a structure for visitor services, including a public restroom facility.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish a structure for visitor services on the Arlington Ridge tract, in the area of the U.S. Marine Corps War Memorial, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-06-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5206) |
2017-06-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1073. |
2017-06-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5206-5207) |
2017-06-27 | House | Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 67. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-113. |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Virginia
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Virginia