US HB1044 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Access to Rural Anesthesiology Act of 2011 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to provide payment under Medicare part A (Hospital Insurance) on a reasonable cost basis for anesthesia services furnished by a physician who is an anesthesiologist in certain rural hospitals in the same manner as payment is made for anesthesia services furnished by a certified registered nurse anesthetists in such hospitals.
Title
Medicare Access to Rural Anesthesiology Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Todd Akin [R-MO] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jo Bonner [R-AL] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Hansen Clarke [D-MI] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1680 (Related) 2011-10-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3859 (Related) 2012-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3859 (Related) 2012-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1044/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1044/BILLS-112hr1044ih.pdf |