TX SJR60 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment establishing a lower amount for expenses that can be charged to a borrower and removing certain financing expense limitations for a home equity loan, establishing certain authorized lenders to make a home equity loan, changing certain options for the refinancing of home equity loans, changing the threshold for an advance of a home equity line of credit, and allowing home equity loans on agricultural homesteads.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment establishing a lower amount for expenses that can be charged to a borrower and removing certain financing expense limitations for a home equity loan, establishing certain authorized lenders to make a home equity loan, changing certain options for the refinancing of home equity loans, changing the threshold for an advance of a home equity line of credit, and allowing home equity loans on agricultural homesteads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-06 - House - Adopted RV#987 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10 Filed with the Secretary of State
2017-05-09HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-09SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-08SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-08SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAdopted
2017-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Investments & Financial Services
2017-05-02HouseRead first time
2017-04-24HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenatePassed
2017-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback