TX SJR51 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the unsolicited distribution of an application form for an absentee ballot.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the unsolicited distribution of an application form for an absentee ballot.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |