TX SJR39 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Co-author authorized
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-01 - Co-author authorized
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide and guarantee loans to encourage advanced clean energy projects.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide and guarantee loans to encourage advanced clean energy projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-01 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HJR123 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2111 (Enabled by) 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB2111 (Enabled by) 2009-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
BONDS
Environment
Environment--Air
LOANS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Environment
Environment--Air
LOANS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Utilities
Utilities--Electric