TX SJR27 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment creating the Texas Connectivity Fund for the development of broadband and other telecommunications services in all areas of the state and authorizing the appropriation to that fund of a portion of revenue received from the existing state sales and use taxes on telecommunications services while not increasing the rate of the sales and use taxes.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment creating the Texas Connectivity Fund for the development of broadband and other telecommunications services in all areas of the state and authorizing the appropriation to that fund of a portion of revenue received from the existing state sales and use taxes on telecommunications services while not increasing the rate of the sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB377 (Enabled by) 2023-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS CONNECTIVITY FUND
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS CONNECTIVITY FUND
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SJR27 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SJ00027I.htm |