TX SJR27 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment repealing county authority to provide for manual labor poor houses and farms.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment repealing county authority to provide for manual labor poor houses and farms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-03 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Labor
Labor--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
County Government--General
Labor
Labor--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments