TX SJR24 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the appropriation of the net revenue received from the imposition of state sales and use taxes on sporting goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the appropriation of the net revenue received from the imposition of state sales and use taxes on sporting goods.

Sponsors

Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Peter Flores [R]
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]
Sen. Robert Nichols [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Nathan Johnson [D]
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Beverly Powell [D]
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Royce West [D]
Sen. John Whitmire [D]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Rep. Chris Turner [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]
Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Gina Calanni [D]
Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]
Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Jay Dean [R]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Harold Dutton [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]
Rep. Art Fierro [D]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]
Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]
Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Tracy King [D]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]
Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Eddie Lucio [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]
Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Joseph Moody [D]Rep. Christina Morales [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]
Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Mary Perez [D]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]
Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]
Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]Rep. Shawn Thierry [D]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. John Turner [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]Rep. Armando Walle [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. Eugene Wu [D]
Rep. William Zedler [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - Adopted as amended RV#547 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#547
2019-04-23HouseAdopted as amended
2019-04-23HouseAmended 1-Cyrier
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HJR39
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2018-12-20SenateFiled
2018-12-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB526 (Enabled by) 2019-03-05 - Co-author authorized
HJR39 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
SB26 (Enabled by) 2019-04-24 - House passage as amended reported

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback