TX SJR22 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 36-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the right to hunt, fish, and harvest wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - SJR 22Third Reading House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 25 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2015-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-20 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-20 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2015-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments