TX SJR21 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment increasing the amount of the residence homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation for public school purposes, providing for the increase of the exemption amount in subsequent years to reflect inflation, and providing for a reduction of the limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed for those purposes on the homestead of a disabled or elderly person to reflect the increased exemption amounts.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment increasing the amount of the residence homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation for public school purposes, providing for the increase of the exemption amount in subsequent years to reflect inflation, and providing for a reduction of the limitation on the total amount of ad valorem taxes that may be imposed for those purposes on the homestead of a disabled or elderly person to reflect the increased exemption amounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB278 (Enabled by) 2015-03-04 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Disabilities, Persons with
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SJR21 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SJ00021I.htm |