TX SJR2 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 92-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Applying to the Congress of the United States to call a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for the limited purpose of proposing one or more amendments to the constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, to limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and to limit the terms of office of federal officials and members of Congress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applying to the Congress of the United States to call a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for the limited purpose of proposing one or more amendments to the constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, to limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and to limit the terms of office of federal officials and members of Congress.

Sponsors

Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Donald Huffines [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Konni Burton [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]
Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Scott Cosper [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Tony Dale [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Pat Fallon [R]
Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Lance Gooden [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]
Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]
Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Leighton Schubert [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Adopted as amended RV#746 (Y: 94 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Amendment tabled RV#745 (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - RV#744 (Y: 99 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11 Filed with the Secretary of State
2017-05-11HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-11SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-10HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-10SenateRead
2017-05-10SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-05SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HouseAdopted as amended
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HouseAmendment tabled
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HouseAmended
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-01HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-04-28HouseRecommitted to committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-10HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2017-04-10HouseRead first time
2017-03-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-02-28SenateReported engrossed
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateAdopted
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateAmendment tabled
2017-02-28SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateAmendment tabled
2017-02-28SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-28SenateRead 2nd time
2017-02-28SenateRecord vote
2017-02-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-02-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-25SenateRead first time
2016-12-06SenateFiled
2016-12-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SJR2
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SJ00002I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SJ00002S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SJ00002E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SJ00002H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SJ00002F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ02-28-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SJR2&RcdVtNo=744&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SJR2&RcdVtNo=745&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SJR2&RcdVtNo=746&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ02-28-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-10-F.PDF#page=53

Bill Comments

feedback