TX SJR2 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation a portion of the market value of tangible personal property a person owns that is held or used for the production of income.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation a portion of the market value of tangible personal property a person owns that is held or used for the production of income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB5 (Enabled by) 2023-04-10 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Business & Commerce--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions