TX SJR13 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring certain revenue collected by a public entity from the use of a tolled highway project in this state to be used only for roadways.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring certain revenue collected by a public entity from the use of a tolled highway project in this state to be used only for roadways.
Sponsors
Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Chris Harris [R] | Rep. Larry Phillips [R] |
Sen. Florence Shapiro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-16 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-27 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-04-27 | Record vote | |
2011-04-27 | Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-27 | Record vote | |
2011-04-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2010-12-15 | Filed | |
2010-12-15 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Highways
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous