TX SCR9 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designating San Marcos as the official Mermaid Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating San Marcos as the official Mermaid Capital of Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Adopted RV#894 (Y: 117 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#894
2021-05-08HouseAdopted
2021-05-08HouseLaid before the House
2021-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HCR 13
2021-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateAdopted
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Administration
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-02SenateFiled
2021-02-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HCR13 (Similar To) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback