TX SCR85 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor

Summary

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 2064.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 2064.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2009-06-03 Sent to the Governor
2009-06-03 Signed in the House
2009-06-02 Signed in the Senate
2009-06-01 Reported enrolled
2009-06-01 House passage reported
2009-06-01 Record vote
2009-06-01 Adopted
2009-06-01 Laid before the House
2009-06-01 Received from the Senate
2009-06-01 Record vote
2009-06-01 Adopted
2009-06-01 Read
2009-06-01 Laid before the Senate
2009-06-01 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback