TX SCR8 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the cannon as the official state gun of Texas.
Title
Designating the cannon as the official state gun of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Adopted as amended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as amended |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CANNON
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--State Symbols
STATE GUN
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--State Symbols
STATE GUN