TX SCR79 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Honoring the life of Alonzo John Wemple and his role in the history of this state and nation.
Title
Honoring the life of Alonzo John Wemple and his role in the history of this state and nation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-31 | Adopted | |
2009-05-31 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-25 | Read & adopted | |
2009-05-25 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |