TX SCR7 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 17 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 17 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 11, 2017, and ending on Tuesday, January 17, 2017.
Title
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 11, 2017, and ending on Tuesday, January 17, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-11 - House - Adopted RV#3 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2017-01-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-01-17 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-01-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-01-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-01-11 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-11 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-01-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Read |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |