TX SCR67 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Authorizing the Texas Legislative Council to pay membership dues to the Council of State Governments for state officers.
Title
Authorizing the Texas Legislative Council to pay membership dues to the Council of State Governments for state officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Adopted | |
2009-05-31 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-27 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-27 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-27 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to House Administration | |
2009-05-20 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | Adopted | |
2009-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Permission to introduce | |
2009-04-28 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COUNCIL OF STATE GOVERNMENTS
Governor
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Governor
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations