TX SCR61 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 1450.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the senate to make corrections in S.B. No. 1450.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Adopted RV#2054 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-29SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-29HouseRecord vote
2017-05-29HouseAdopted
2017-05-29HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-29SenateRecord vote
2017-05-29SenateAdopted
2017-05-29SenateRead
2017-05-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback