TX SCR6 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Recognizing January 27, 2009, as Lubbock Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing January 27, 2009, as Lubbock Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-02-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-02-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-02-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-01-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-01-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-01-27 | Adopted | |
2009-01-27 | Laid before the House | |
2009-01-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-01-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-01-27 | Read & adopted | |
2009-01-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-01-23 | Filed | |
2009-01-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LUBBOCK DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates